NY A07717 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4786a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4786a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the termination without penalty of certain service contracts; allows active duty service members under certain conditions to cancel contracts without penalty with telecommunications service providers, internet service providers, health clubs, health spas, or television service providers when they receive their orders; requires service members include a copy of their orders when providing written notice.
Title
Relates to the termination without penalty of certain service contracts; allows active duty service members under certain conditions to cancel contracts without penalty with telecommunications service providers, internet service providers, health clubs, health spas, or television service providers when they receive their orders; requires service members include a copy of their orders when providing written notice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4786a |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.54 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.54 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | print number 7717a |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04786 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.164