NY A07714 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - substituted by s5317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-23 - substituted by s5317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a warning to be printed on baby-bottle and sippy cup packaging concerning tooth decay.
Title
Requires a warning to be printed on baby-bottle and sippy cup packaging concerning tooth decay.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5317 |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.597 |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.597 |
2011-06-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05317 (Same As) 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.79