NY A07709 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5646
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5646
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Iqra Darul Ehsan, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits the Iqra Darul Ehsan, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5646 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.414 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.414 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05646 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.346