NY A07708 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s5768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the scheduling of annual meetings of boards of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the scheduling of annual meetings of boards of education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s5768
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.513
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.513
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-16Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05768 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.526

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback