NY S05768 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the scheduling of annual meetings of boards of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the scheduling of annual meetings of boards of education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-20AssemblySIGNED CHAP.526
2019-11-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.513
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7708
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1057
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07708 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s5768

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback