NY A07705 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-03 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-03 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualified emerging technology company facilities, operations and training credit.
Title
Relates to the qualified emerging technology company facilities, operations and training credit.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Joseph Morelle [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-03 | Senate | tabled |
2012-01-03 | Senate | vetoed memo.86 |
2011-12-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1438 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5633B |
2011-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7705b |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7705a |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05633 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7705B