NY A07704 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to behavioral health parity; requires facilities to perform daily clinical review of a patient and consult periodically with the insurer regarding the patient's progress, course of treatment, and discharge plan; requires insurers to actively participate in facility-initiated periodic consultations prior to the patient's discharge; makes related provisions (Part A); provides that no policy shall require prior authorization for an initial or renewal prescription for drugs for the detoxification or maintenance of a substance use disorder; makes related provisions (Part B).
Title
Relates to behavioral health parity; requires facilities to perform daily clinical review of a patient and consult periodically with the insurer regarding the patient's progress, course of treatment, and discharge plan; requires insurers to actively participate in facility-initiated periodic consultations prior to the patient's discharge; makes related provisions (Part A); provides that no policy shall require prior authorization for an initial or renewal prescription for drugs for the detoxification or maintenance of a substance use disorder; makes related provisions (Part B).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7704a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.270 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.778 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.778 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |