NY A07702 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - print number 7702a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - print number 7702a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conditions of registration for nonresident pharmacies.
Title
Relates to conditions of registration for nonresident pharmacies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7702a |
2014-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05392 (Same As) 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5392A