NY A07657 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s7016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s7016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to enforcement of support obligations through the suspension of driving privileges.
Title
Extends provisions relating to enforcement of support obligations through the suspension of driving privileges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s7016 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.271 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.271 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S07016 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.183