NY A07645 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - signed chap.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the duration and amount of maintenance and of spousal support; establishes new formulas for the amount of maintenance and spousal support and factors the court can use to deviate from that amount.
Title
Relates to the duration and amount of maintenance and of spousal support; establishes new formulas for the amount of maintenance and spousal support and factors the court can use to deviate from that amount.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Senate | signed chap.269 |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5678 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.299 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05678 (Same As) 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7645