NY A07639 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for certain peace officers in Putnam county; allows peace officers residing in counties adjacent to Putnam county to be appointed as peace officers for the Putnam county society for the prevention of cruelty to animals.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for certain peace officers in Putnam county; allows peace officers residing in counties adjacent to Putnam county to be appointed as peace officers for the Putnam county society for the prevention of cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Assembly | signed chap.263 |
2021-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1068 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6327 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.389 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.389 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06327 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7639