NY A07636 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6579
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6579
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Divya Jyoti Jagrati Kendra to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes Divya Jyoti Jagrati Kendra to file an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6579 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.489 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06579 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.297