NY A07632 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes cities and towns, except a city with a population of one million or more, to establish community preservation funds and community housing funds; authorizes such cities and towns to impose a real estate transfer tax with revenues to be deposited in such funds; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes cities and towns, except a city with a population of one million or more, to establish community preservation funds and community housing funds; authorizes such cities and towns to impose a real estate transfer tax with revenues to be deposited in such funds; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Colin Schmitt [R] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07041 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT