NY A07609 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the bonding authority of the New York City housing development corporation.
Title
Increases the bonding authority of the New York City housing development corporation.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6917 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.385 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.385 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06917 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.598