NY A07606 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - signed chap.230
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - signed chap.230
Summary
To extend for three additional years the authority for villages to hold annual tax lien sales as a means of enforcing collection of delinquent taxes.
Title
Extends the authority for villages to hold tax lien sales.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | signed chap.230 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-09 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-09 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-09 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.670 | |
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5145 | |
2009-06-02 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-06-02 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-02 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-28 | advanced to third reading cal.688 | |
2009-05-27 | reported | |
2009-05-12 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-04-16 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05145 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - signed chap.230
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07606&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |