NY A07605 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to integrating community supervision programs into an individual's employment, educational or vocational training schedule.
Title
Relates to integrating community supervision programs into an individual's employment, educational or vocational training schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.533 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.472 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08741 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES