NY A07603 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes EMTs within provisions for awards to spouses of certain employees killed in the line of duty.
Title
Includes EMTs within provisions for awards to spouses of certain employees killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5706 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.607 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05706 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.387