NY A07603 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residency of the village clerk-treasurer and deputy clerk-treasurer of the village of Victory, county of Saratoga.
Title
Relates to the residency of the village clerk-treasurer and deputy clerk-treasurer of the village of Victory, county of Saratoga.
Sponsors
Asm. Tony Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.470 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.470 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7603a |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05596 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.140