NY A07599 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to warrants and orders of protection in persons in need of supervision cases.
Title
Relates to warrants and orders of protection in persons in need of supervision cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | tabled |
2011-09-23 | Senate | vetoed memo.65 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.300 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4050B |
2011-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.487 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7599b |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7599a |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04050 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7599B