NY A07592 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-03 - signed chap.337
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-03 - signed chap.337
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing school districts in the town of Canaan in the county of Columbia to use real property located outside of its territorial limits.
Title
Relates to authorizing school districts in the town of Canaan in the county of Columbia to use real property located outside of its territorial limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-03 | Senate | signed chap.337 |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1626 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5856 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.702 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.702 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | print number 7592c |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7592b |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | print number 7592a |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05454 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05856 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7592C
S05856 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7592C