NY A07583 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6462
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the authority of the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District to lease certain properties.
Title
Clarifies the authority of the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District to lease certain properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6462 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.606 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | print number 7583a |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06462 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.264