NY A07583 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals certain sections of the general municipal law, in relation to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies; repeals certain sections of the public authorities law, in relation to certain authorities; transfers any books, records and remaining rights of any dissolved facility to an identifiable location.
Title
Repeals certain sections of the general municipal law, in relation to urban renewal agencies and industrial development agencies; repeals certain sections of the public authorities law, in relation to certain authorities; transfers any books, records and remaining rights of any dissolved facility to an identifiable location.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-10 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 7583 |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7583a |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05227 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8823A