NY A07579 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.319
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.319
Summary
Authorizes filing of application for real property tax exemption by town of Ramapo.
Title
Authorizes filing of application for real property tax exemption by town of Ramapo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | signed chap.319 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.797 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5309A | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-17 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-17 | ordered to third reading rules cal.430 | |
2009-06-17 | rules report cal.430 | |
2009-06-17 | reported | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-10 | print number 7579a | |
2009-06-10 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2009-04-16 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05309 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.319
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07579&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |