NY S05309 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.319

Summary

DELETE Authorizes filing of application for real property tax exemption by town of Ramapo.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DELETE Authorizes filing of application for real property tax exemption by town of Ramapo.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-16 SUBSTITUTED BY A7579A
2009-07-15 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.797
2009-07-15 COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2009-06-18 PRINT NUMBER 5309A
2009-06-18 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2009-04-27 REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07579 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.319

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback