NY A07576 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.530
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.530
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to significant programmatic accomplishment for limited credit time allowances for certain inmates; now includes completion of an associate's, bachelor's or master's degree.
Title
Relates to significant programmatic accomplishment for limited credit time allowances for certain inmates; now includes completion of an associate's, bachelor's or master's degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.530 |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7576a |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.471 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06453 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION