NY A07568 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - print number 7568a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - print number 7568a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to abolishing several commissions, committees, boards and panels, including the empire state plaza art commission, the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation, the plant industry advisory committee, the manufactured housing advisory council; the New York state collectable series panel and the child performer advisory board to prevent eating disorders.
Title
Relates to abolishing several commissions, committees, boards and panels, including the empire state plaza art commission, the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation, the plant industry advisory committee, the manufactured housing advisory council; the New York state collectable series panel and the child performer advisory board to prevent eating disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | print number 7568a |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04511 (Same As) 2014-04-30 - referred to governmental operations