NY A07556 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - print number 7556a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - print number 7556a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Big Five African Trophies Act" relating to banning the importation, transportation and possession of certain African wildlife species and products.
Title
Enacts the "Big Five African Trophies Act" relating to banning the importation, transportation and possession of certain African wildlife species and products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Assembly | print number 7556a |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04325 (Same As) 2020-05-29 - PRINT NUMBER 4325A