NY A07547 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - print number 7547b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - print number 7547b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing state university police, regional state park police and detective investigators for the office of the attorney general to receive additional service credit in an optional twenty year retirement plan.
Title
Relates to authorizing state university police, regional state park police and detective investigators for the office of the attorney general to receive additional service credit in an optional twenty year retirement plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Assembly | print number 7547b |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | print number 7547a |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07108 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - PRINT NUMBER 7108B