NY A07547 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - substituted by s5113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a quorum of the advisory council on lead poisoning prevention; sets a quorum as a majority of voting membership of the council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a quorum of the advisory council on lead poisoning prevention; sets a quorum as a majority of voting membership of the council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblysubstituted by s5113
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.451
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05113 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback