NY A07516 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Harper's Law" requiring tip restraint devices on certain furniture.
Title
Enacts "Harper's Law" requiring tip restraint devices on certain furniture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7516c |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.914 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-27 | Assembly | print number 7516b |
2018-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | print number 7516a |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-04-28 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08766 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES