NY A07506 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires grease traps at food service establishments be designed to withstand expected loads and prevent unauthorized access.
Title
Requires grease traps at food service establishments be designed to withstand expected loads and prevent unauthorized access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.116 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.753 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.358 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3536A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.256 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03536 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7506