NY A07481 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6714
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the import of dairy products and payment from the milk producers security fund.
Title
Relates to the import of dairy products and payment from the milk producers security fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s6714 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.248 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.248 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S06714 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.228