NY A07479 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Voter Enfranchisement Modernization Act of 2019; makes provisions take effect on the same date and in the same manner as the New York automatic voter registration act of 2020.
Title
Relates to the Voter Enfranchisement Modernization Act of 2019; makes provisions take effect on the same date and in the same manner as the New York automatic voter registration act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.243 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.479 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.479 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |