NY A07466 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the expungement of syringe convictions of criminally possessing a hypodermic instrument.
Title
Provides for the expungement of syringe convictions of criminally possessing a hypodermic instrument.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.374 |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00502 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES