NY S00502 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the expungement of syringe convictions of criminally possessing a hypodermic instrument.
Title
Relates to the expungement of syringe convictions of criminally possessing a hypodermic instrument.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1668 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07466 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.374