NY A07452 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.812
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.812
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to business interruption insurance.
Title
Relates to business interruption insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.812 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.360 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7452a |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.439 |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05580 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE