NY A07430 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - committed to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - committed to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the management of the Roosevelt Island operating corporation.
Title
Relates to the management of the Roosevelt Island operating corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.287 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.389 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.389 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | print number 7430a |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00922 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CITIES