NY A07430 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.428
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-07 - signed chap.428
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the homeless veterans assistance fund and authorizes gifts to such fund through a state income tax check-off.
Title
Establishes the homeless veterans assistance fund and authorizes gifts to such fund through a state income tax check-off.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-07 | Senate | signed chap.428 |
2014-11-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1072 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4760A |
2014-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7430a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.357 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.357 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04760 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7430A