NY A07420 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for eligibility of certain participants in the New York City employees retirement system to opt into the twenty-five year retirement program for EMT members.
Title
Provides for eligibility of certain participants in the New York City employees retirement system to opt into the twenty-five year retirement program for EMT members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Assembly | tabled |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | vetoed memo.96 |
2023-11-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1536 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6976 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.554 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.554 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06976 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7420