NY A07407 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-5)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes new targets for offshore wind electricity generation; includes the requirements that there is at least 9,900 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2035, 15,800 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2040, at least 18,000 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2045 and at least 20,000 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2050.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes new targets for offshore wind electricity generation; includes the requirements that there is at least 9,900 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2035, 15,800 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2040, at least 18,000 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2045 and at least 20,000 megawatts of offshore wind electricity generation by 2050.

Sponsors

Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Tony Simone [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Maryjane Shimsky [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Sarahana Shrestha [D]Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. Brian Cunningham [D]
Asm. Christopher Eachus [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Juan Ardila [D]
Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]Asm. Steven Raga [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. John Zaccaro [D]Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]
Asm. Demond Meeks [D]Asm. William Conrad [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Alex Bores [D]
Asm. Grace Lee [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Matthew Slater [R]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Emily Gallagher [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Zohran Kwame Mamdani [D]
Asm. Scott Bendett [R]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. George Alvarez [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Anna Kelles [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. John McGowan [R]
Asm. Edward Flood [R]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]

Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-19Assemblyreferred to energy

Same As/Similar To

S06327 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback