NY A07394 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - signed chap.123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage monkfish to 2024.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage monkfish to 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | Assembly | signed chap.123 |
2021-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1427 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7065 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.388 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07065 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7394