NY A07390 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits midwives and physician assistants to certify the cause of death on a fetal death certificate if they are in attendance at or after a fetal death.
Title
Permits midwives and physician assistants to certify the cause of death on a fetal death certificate if they are in attendance at or after a fetal death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.311 |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03451 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION