NY A07368 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the filing of applications and renewal applications for real property tax abatement programs to July 15, 2021.
Title
Extends the deadline for the filing of applications and renewal applications for real property tax abatement programs to July 15, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6086 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.472 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06086 (Same As) 2021-08-20 - SIGNED CHAP.409