NY A07363 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - signed chap.648
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - signed chap.648
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Protects patients from liens against their primary residence and wage garnishment due to money judgments arising from actions brought by hospitals or health care professionals.
Title
Protects patients from liens against their primary residence and wage garnishment due to money judgments arising from actions brought by hospitals or health care professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | signed chap.648 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.449 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6522A |
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7363a |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.295 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06522 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7363A