NY A07363 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that rehabilitation programs for female inmates in state correctional facilities be equivalent to those provided to male inmates of correctional facilities elsewhere in the state; provides that such rehabilitation programs shall include, but not be limited to, vocational, academic and industrial programs.
Title
Requires that rehabilitation programs for female inmates in state correctional facilities be equivalent to those provided to male inmates of correctional facilities elsewhere in the state; provides that such rehabilitation programs shall include, but not be limited to, vocational, academic and industrial programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.50 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03817 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION