NY A07359 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires OPWDD to purchase and provide essential personal protection equipment to all direct support professionals, care recipients and group home providers in the event of a declaration of a state emergency that relates to public health.
Title
Requires OPWDD to purchase and provide essential personal protection equipment to all direct support professionals, care recipients and group home providers in the event of a declaration of a state emergency that relates to public health.
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S06295 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE