NY S06295 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires OPWDD to purchase and provide essential personal protection equipment to all direct support professionals, care recipients and group home providers in the event of a declaration of a state emergency that relates to public health.
Title
Requires OPWDD to purchase and provide essential personal protection equipment to all direct support professionals, care recipients and group home providers in the event of a declaration of a state emergency that relates to public health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07359 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means