NY A07359 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s5119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s5119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a taxpayer assistance authorization for households in the town of Sennett, county of Cayuga.
Title
Provides for a taxpayer assistance authorization for households in the town of Sennett, county of Cayuga.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Oaks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5119 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.601 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05119 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.285