NY A07352 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.513
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Ron Kim [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] |
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Nily Rozic [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.513 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.462 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |