NY A07317 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale, lease or other disposition of property of the city, New York city department of education, New York education construction fund, school construction authority and New York city housing authority; requires all disposition to be subject to New York city's uniform land use review procedure and requires prior notification and community consultation.
Title
Relates to the sale, lease or other disposition of property of the city, New York city department of education, New York education construction fund, school construction authority and New York city housing authority; requires all disposition to be subject to New York city's uniform land use review procedure and requires prior notification and community consultation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | print number 7317a |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2013-05-10 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05597 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES